Signal active
Bio
Edward Kozel served as a member of Yahoo's board of directors from October 2000 to May 2008. He has served as the chairman of Skyrider, Inc. since December 2007, and was its Chief Executive Officer from March 2006 until December 2007. Mr. Kozel was also a managing member of Open Range Ventures, a venture capital firm, from January 2000 until December 2006. Between January 2004 and December 2004, Mr. Kozel was a managing director of Integrated Finance, Ltd., a private advisory services firm. Until 2002 he was a member of the Board of Directors of Cisco Systems, Inc., where he worked for 11 years in a variety of roles, including chief technology officer and senior vice president of business development. During his tenure at Cisco, he founded the business development group which, under his direction, was responsible for more than 22 technology acquisitions and 25 minority investments. Mr. Kozel is an industry innovator who previously worked at Boeing, McDonnell Douglas and SRI International, where he participated in the early design and development of the Internetwork Protocol (IP) model and TCP/IP, packet radio networks and highly distributed information systems. In addition to Yahoo, Mr. Kozel served as a director of Reuters Group PLC from March 2000 to April 2007 and is currently a director of Network Appliance, Inc. He graduated from the University of California, Davis with a degree in electrical engineering.
Yahoo's statement upon Ed Kozel's departure in May 2008: “On May 20, 2008, Mr. Edward Kozel resigned from the Board of Directors of Yahoo Inc. (the “Companyâ€). Mr. Kozel noted in a letter to the Company that he had intended to leave the Board of Directors in February to spend more time with his family, but decided to stay on the Board of Directors following the Company’s receipt of an unsolicited proposal from Microsoft (NSDQ: MSFT). Mr. Kozel noted his plan to focus on personal matters, including relocating his family to Europe this summer. Mr. Kozel has served as a member of the Company’s Board of Directors since October 2000, serving as Chair of the Audit Committee from April 2002 to March 2008. In connection with Mr. Kozel’s resignation, the Company’s Board of Directors reduced the size of the Board of Directors from ten directors to nine directors. “
Location
San Francisco, California, United States, North America
Social
Primary Organization
N/A
Jobs history
0
N/A
Board and Advisor Roles
0
N/A
Invest in regions
Profile Resume
Ed Kozel is the Investor, Board Member at Open Range, based in United States, North America. Explore their detailed professional journey, key connections, and contributions to the industry on our platform.
Investment portfolio
3
0
Personal investment
3
Annouced Date | Organization Name | Funding Round | Money Raised |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2000 | AlterEgo Networks | Series A - AlterEgo Networks | 7.3M |
Jul 19, 2000 | Caw Networks | Venture Round - Caw Networks | 9.0M |
Sep 02, 2016 | Bitmovin | Series A - Bitmovin | 10.3M |
Partner investment
0
There is no partner investment available on this profile
Exits
0
There is no exit available on this Profile
Invest in industries
N/A
Recent Activity
There is no recent news or activity for this profile.