Signal active
Bio
Ian was Chief Executive of SSE, one of the UK’s leading utility companies and Scotland’s largest industrial company for over ten years. He stepped down from that position in the summer of 2013. Ian is now Chairman of Infinis Energy plc, a renewable energy company; Independent Chairman of the oil services company, the John Wood group and Nova Innovation; as well as holding various advisory and non-executive positions in other organisations. Ian is a renowned and innovative leader in the energy industry, and was welcomed to Synaptec’s advisory board in July 2016.
Location
Edinburgh, Edinburgh, City of, United Kingdom, Europe
Social
Primary Organization
1909
251-500
Education, Association, Non Profit
Jobs history
1
Thames Water
Chairman Of The Board
2018 - Current
Board and Advisor Roles
0
N/A
Invest in regions
Profile Resume
Ian Marchant is the Honorary President at Royal Zoological Society of Scotland, based in Europe. With a background in Education, Ian Marchant has a rich history of leadership and innovation. Explore their detailed professional journey, key connections, and contributions to the industry on our platform.
Recommendation from your interest
Chris Joly
Board of Director
Rob Dobson
Chairman and Co-Founder
Richard Lewis
Chairman
Sam Laidlaw
CEO
N/A
Nigel Ellis
NON-EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Investment portfolio
8
2
Personal investment
8
Annouced Date | Organization Name | Funding Round | Money Raised |
---|---|---|---|
Jul 20, 2016 | Moixa Technology | Series A - Moixa Technology | 1.3M |
Aug 02, 2016 | Synaptec | Seed Round - Synaptec | 493.7K |
Dec 01, 2016 | Piclo | Seed Round - Piclo | 504.2K |
Sep 01, 2018 | Piclo | Seed Round - Piclo | 674.2K |
Partner investment
1
Annouced Date | Organization Name | Funding Round | Investor Name | Money Raised |
---|---|---|---|---|
Jun 27, 2021 | Ev.energy | Series A - Ev.energy | Dunelm Energy | 8.8M |
Invest in industries
Recent Activity
There is no recent news or activity for this profile.